DE SB9 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This charter change reverts the times that polls will be open in the City of New Castle back to their original times. The earlier opening and later closing proved to be a burden on workers and the Department of Election and few voters arrived before 8 a.m. and after 6 p.m.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of New Castle Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-01-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to House Administration Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |