DE SB89 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes the following changes related to traffic control devices erected on order of the Secretary of the Department of Transportation (Secretary) limiting the size and weight of vehicles and loads permitted on a specific highway:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Traffic Control Devices For Size And Weight Of Vehicles And Loads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-05-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-05-14 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-31 | Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2021-03-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-30 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 89 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-30 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |