DE SB86 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies the voting eligibility of inactive and retired members of the Delaware Association of Professional Engineers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Professional Engineers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |