DE SB84 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes consistent the amount of time that the Court "looks back" to determine if the current offense is a second offense for the purposes of sentencing. This Act applies to Traffic offenses, but it would not be applicable to DUI cases.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Second And Subsequent Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Sen. Bryant Richardson [R] | Sen. David Lawson [R] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-04-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-04-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-17 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 84 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-01-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-14 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2017-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-17 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate |