DE SB82 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Senate Bill 20 of the 147th General Assembly (79 Del. Laws c. 251) formally established the Prison Education program in Chapter 24 of Title 14 of the Delaware Code. Employees of the Prison Education program whose primary job location is within an institution have been eligible to receive hazardous duty pay for several years, this legislation simply updates Title 29 to reflect the authorization already existing in Chapter 24 of Title 14 and in the Budget Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Relating To The Merit System And The Prison Educational Unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-05-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |