DE SB65 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Senate Bill No. 65 establishes the Focus on Alternative Skills Training Program ("FAST"). FAST will provide tuition assistance, to Delaware residents who have obtained a high school diploma, Diploma of Alternate Achievement Standards, or a Delaware secondary credential, which includes earning a GED, and have enrolled in an approved non-degree credit certificate program. The Workforce Development Board will create a list of non-degree credit certificate programs approved for the FAST program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Focus On Alternative Skills Training Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-29 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-25 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-11 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-10 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-25 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 65, and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |