DE SB64 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of Georgetown to give the Town Council the authority to impose and collect a lodging tax, as permitted by ยง 908 of Title 22.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of Georgetown Relating To The Power To Impose And Collect A Lodging Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-02 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |