DE SB64 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
At the recommendation of the Joint Sunset Committee and in an effort to make it less difficult to find qualified members to fill the Open Space Council, this Act simplifies the appointment terms and expirations and requires that all three counties be represented generally, rather than require specific numbers of members from each county. In addition, this Act adds language for the removal of Council members for gross inefficiency, neglect of duty, malfeasance, misfeasance, or nonfeasance. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform to the style and formatting guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Land Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 3 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |