DE SB6 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates the Delaware Large Capacity Magazine Prohibition Act of 2021. The Act includes clear definitions for the term large-capacity magazine, as an ammunition feeding device with a capacity to accept more than 17 rounds of ammunition. After enactment, possession of large-capacity magazine will be a class B misdemeanor for a first offense and a class E felony for any subsequent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Deadly Weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 2 to SB 6 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 1 to SB 6 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-23 Amendment HA 2 to SB 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-05-12 Amendment HA 1 to SB 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-04-27 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2021-04-15 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2021-04-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
2021-04-01 Lifted From Table in Senate
2021-04-01 Laid On Table in Senate
2021-04-01 Amendment SA 1 to SB 6 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2021-03-31 Amendment SA 1 to SB 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-03-31 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-03-25 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback