DE SB56 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill implements a portion of the federal requirements in the bipartisan Preventing Sex Trafficking and Strengthening Families Act to promote greater normalcy for youth in foster care. Specifically, it provides a limitation from liability provision for foster parents who exercise the reasonable and prudent parent standard for those youth in their care to allow their participation in age appropriate activities. Section 2523(b) provides certain criteria to determine whether a decision is reasonable and prudent, including: the wishes of the child; the wishes of the childs parent; best interests of the child; the childs age, maturity, and any potential risk factors to the child or others; and the appropriateness of the activity and experience for extracurricular, cultural, or social enrichment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Children In Dscyf Custody.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-17 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-05-18 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2017-05-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Amendment SA 1 to SB 56 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-04 Amendment SA 1 to SB 56 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback