DE SB51 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Town Council for the Town of Millsboro determined that the way they award contracts should be improved. The amount that initiates the process is increased from $20,000 to $50,000 to better reflect the current cost of ordinary purchases that the Town must make. This Act also allows the Town of Millsboro to have the ability to award a contract to a bidder other than the lowest bidder while also laying out the factors that the Town Council must use in determining who is a responsive and responsible bidder in accordance with their bid vetting process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Millsboro Relating To Contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-11 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2019-04-09 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-03-27 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-03-19 Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback