DE SB50 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]

Summary

Delaware's statewide community college system, operated by Delaware Technical and Community College (the College), plays a critical role in the State's economy by providing workforce development, vocational training, and transfer education that connects Delawareans with good paying jobs within the State and region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Establishment Of A Community College Infrastructure Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Signed by Governor
2019-04-11 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES
2019-04-11 Amendment HA 1 to SS 2 - Defeated By House. Votes: 11 YES 29 NO
2019-04-11 Amendment HA 1 to SS 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-04-10 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-03-27 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2019-03-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2019-03-23 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 50

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback