DE SB48 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Under this Act, a pharmacist who dispenses narloxone under an established set of circumstances is not subject to disciplinary or other adverse action under any professional licensing statute or criminal liability, or liable for damages related to injuries or death sustained in connection with administering the drug, unless it is established that the pharmacist caused the injuries or death wilfully, wantonly, or by gross negligence.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Naloxone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-06 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2017-06-06 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-06 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 48 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-05-16 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 48 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-27 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2017-04-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |