DE SB46 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation modernizes Delaware's Self-Service Storage Facility Act to account for the wide proliferation of online news and auction sites, as well as to establish frameworks for: (1) towing of certain property for which rent and other charges are in default; (2) use of information contained within property sold or otherwise disposed of; and (3) contractual provisions relating to limits on the value of stored property and to late fees, as well as transparency related to both.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Self-service Storage Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2017-07-02 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 46 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2017-06-07 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 46 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-02 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2017-04-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-27 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 46 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 46 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2017-03-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |