DE SB43 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act regulates the practice of art therapy placing control of the profession under the Board of Mental health and Chemical Dependency Professionals and amending Chapter 30 of Title 24 by adding Subchapter V. Professional Art Therapists. The Art Therapy Practice Act will serve and protect the public by defining the scope of practice of art therapy; setting minimum standards of qualification, education, training, and experience for art therapists; and maintaining certain standards in the delivery of art therapy services. This Act also requires the Board of Mental Health and Chemical Dependency to appoint one or more credentialed volunteer art therapists to advise and assist the Board in matters pertaining to art therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Licensure Of Art Therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08 Signed by Governor
2017-07-02 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-23 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2017-06-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-06-20 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-13 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 43, and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback