DE SB41 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires risk retention groups (RRGs) to comply with the property and casualty actuarial opinion law and is necessary for maintaining Delaware’s National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) accreditation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Captive Insurance Companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (INSURANCE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance Committee in Senate |