DE SB4 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

In January 2017, the Code Revisors provided the General Assembly with a list of potential technical corrections that they identified as they revised the Delaware Code to reflect legislation that was enacted by the 148th General Assembly in 2016. While technical in nature, these changes are beyond the authority of the Code Revisors to make and can only be done by the General Assembly through legislation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4, Title 16, Title 18, Title 19, Title, 24, Title 29, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Technical Corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-21 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback