DE SB36 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act more effectively and efficiently clarifies the enforcement authority of the Department of Agriculture regarding livestock at large. The offenses will now be civil penalties rather than criminal fines, expenses for impoundment will be reimbursed by the violator, and other sources of media can be used to give public notice of impoundment or sale of any livestock at large. This Act is intended to penalize repeat offenders that knowingly let their livestock run at large.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Stray Livestock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-05-02 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-04 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2017-03-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2017-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |
2017-03-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |