DE SB323 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Sections 1 and 2 of this Bill clarify the definition of acupuncture. Section 2 of this Bill allows acupuncture detoxification specialists to be licensed to perform the limited auricular point protocol for treatment of alcoholism, nicotine dependency, substance abuse, or chemical dependency. Acupuncture detoxification specialists are subject to the jurisdiction of the Board of Medical Practice and the Acupuncture Advisory Council.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24, Chapter 17, Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Medical Practice Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |