DE SB322 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill ensures equal access to diaper changing tables in restrooms in public buildings regardless of the gender for which the restroom is designed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Health And Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-23 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2022-06-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 322 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 322 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |