DE SB303 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will further the purpose of Chapter 30A of Title 16 by clarifying the authority of the Division of Long Term Care Residents Protection to regulate nursing assistant training programs. The Division is currently approving the curriculum of training programs and conducting annual inspections pursuant to Chapter 30A of Title 16. This Act will improve the Division’s authority to regulate those programs by allowing it to impose sanctions for non-compliance with statutes and regulations. It adds the authority to publish, through an on-line listing, the pass rates of the training programs so that consumers can make better informed choices of schools. Finally, it will change the current practice of allowing persons who have been sanctioned for abuse, neglect mistreatment or financial exploitation to remain certified. Persons who have, as part of that sanctions, been “flagged” on the Delaware CNA Registry should have their certification suspended or revoked, depending on circumstances.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Long Term Care Residents Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-17 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |