DE SB3 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Amendment HA 2 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Amendment HA 2 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the first leg of a constitutional amendment to eliminate the limitations on when an individual may vote absentee and authorizes the General Assembly to enact general laws providing the circumstances, rules, and procedures for absentee voting in this State. This Act is in response to the Supreme Courts decision in Albence v. Higgins, 2022 Del. LEXIS 377 (Del. 2022).
Title
An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article V Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Amendment HA 2 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-07 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 3 - Stricken in House | |
2024-02-29 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-05 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-05-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2023-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |
2023-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |