DE SB285 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2017; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 31 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 8 YES 31 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 defeated |
2016-06-29 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 9 YES 12 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 defeated |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |