DE SB280 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Delaware Interscholastic Athletic Association ("DIAA") Task Force. Based on the findings of the task force, this Act updates the DIAA's Executive Director from an education associate level position in the Department of Education to a director level position in the Department.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Interscholastic Athletic Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-16 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2024-05-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |