DE SB265 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides supplementary appropriations to certain Grants-in-Aid for Fiscal Year 20122013. Section 1 – Government Units and Senior Center $20,582,465 $21,632,943 Section 2 – One-Times and Community Agencies $15,450,864 $16,215,516 Section 3 – Fire Companies $4,898,511 $6,070,750 Section 4 – Veterans Organizations $296,360 $302,287 GRAND TOTAL $41,228,200 $44,221,496
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For Certain Grants-in-aid For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2013; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds, Amending The Fiscal Year 2013 Appropriations Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Laid On Table in Senate |