DE SB258 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-26 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-26 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits any autonomous vehicle with a gross weight of 10,001 pounds or more from being operated on a Delaware highway for testing purposes, transporting goods, or transporting passengers without a human safety operator being physically present within the autonomous vehicle. A two-thirds vote requirement is required under Section 28 of Article IV of the Delaware Constitution.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Autonomous Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Spiros Mantzavinos [D] | Rep. Sean Matthews [D] | Sen. Kyle Gay [D] | Sen. David Lawson [R] |
Sen. Jack Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-13 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2024-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-06-13 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-06-13 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-06-12 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-16 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 258 |