DE SB254 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing (1) that our educators are assuming greater levels of responsibility and demonstrating leadership in their classrooms and schools, (2) that our current educator compensation system does not reflect the work we value in our educators or provide them with a meaningful career pathway or ability to earn additional compensation for assuming additional responsibility, and (3) that we must retain and attract great educators to ensure that our students are prepared to compete in an increasingly global economy, this bill establishes parameters for an improved educator compensation system, the details of which will be developed by a Committee to Advance Educator Compensation and Careers. The Committee’s work will involve an alternative compensation structure and career pathway for educators aligned with the parameters set forth in the bill, including providing educators with a meaningful career pathway, including higher starting salaries and recognition for working with high-needs students, and significant leadership opportunities for career advancement that keeps talented educators in the classroom. The Committee must submit its proposed plan to the Governor by November 15, 2014, for consideration for inclusion in the Governor’s recommended budget for fiscal year 2016.
Title
An Act To Establish The Committee To Advance Educator Compensation And Careers And Develop An Alternative Compensation Structure And Career Pathway For Educators In Delaware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-30 | House | Lifted From Table in House |
2014-06-30 | House | Laid On Table in House |
2014-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |