DE SB254 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill will create a State Civil Penalty Trust Fund. Currently, all sanctions which are imposed as a result of the surveys and complaint investigations of this Division are placed in the Long Term Care Residents Trust Fund which is governed by very restrictive federal regulations. It is not compulsory to put the revenue derived from State sanctions into the Long Term Care Trust Fund—but that has been our practice. By splitting the money, and creating a fund which receives civil penalties imposed pursuant to state statutes and regulations, the Division will be better able to support community based residential efforts while, at the same time, taking care of long term care needs with the Long Term Care Trust Fund.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nursing Facilities And Similar Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-01 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-12 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-05-11 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |