DE SB246 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
For over 30 years, the Delaware State Housing Authority (DSHA) has invested in home repair programs that make necessary repairs to improve the health and safety conditions in the homes of Delawareans.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Housing Repair And Modification Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2024-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2024-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 246 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-06-25 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 246 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2024-04-23 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2024-04-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-04-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 246 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-04-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 246 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate |