DE SB245 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Both the Delaware Strategic Fund (Title 29, Chapter 87A, Subchapter II) and the Delaware Technical Innovation Fund (Title 29, Chapter 87A, Subchapter III) provide funding for Delaware businesses, including new businesses in growing technology-related fields. The Delaware Strategic Fund is intended to assist in the development of startup strategies such as seed capital and incubator programs. The Delaware Technical Innovation Fund is intended to promote coordination with Delawares institutions of higher education and the private sector to commercialize innovative products and processes developed by small businesses. This act encourages Delawares institutions of higher education to assist foreign-born, student entrepreneurs, who are engaged in the development of new businesses and technologies in Delaware, to provide them with assistance in maintaining proper legal status within the United States.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-21 | Re-Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House | |
2018-06-20 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 245 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-19 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2018-06-19 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |