DE SB230 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates the option of a supported decision-making agreement for adults who do not need a guardian but who need assistance in gathering information, making decisions, and communicating those decisions. The Act allows these adults, called “principals” in this Act, to select and appoint one or more trusted friends or relatives or a paid provider to act as a supporter. The supporter can provide assistance and guidance on issues affecting the principal, such as coordinating health care and services; making health and service-related decisions; and dealing with housing issues, daily living activities, and routine financial matters. The supporter is not empowered to make decisions for the principal or to substitute the supporter’s judgment for the principal’s. This Act includes safeguards such as limiting who can act as a supporter and requiring a written document with disinterested witnesses. This Act gives the supporter legal status to participate in the decision-making process by gathering information and assisting the principal in making and communicating decisions. A decision or a request communicated by the supporter must be honored on the same basis as a decision or request of the principal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Supported Decision-making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-15SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 9 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-07-01HouseNecessary rules are suspended in House
2016-06-30HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2016-06-29SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 4 NO 6 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-29SenateLifted From Table in Senate
2016-06-28SenateLaid On Table in Senate
2016-06-28SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-28SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2016-04-20SenateReported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-04-14SenateAssigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2016-04-14SenateAssigned to Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback