DE SB218 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - SS 1 for SB 218 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act updates the Delaware Code relating to the Board of Accountancy by modernizing the current accountancy licensing standards using the Uniform Accountancy Model Act language as jointly drafted by the National Association of State Boards of Accountancy and the American Institute of Certified Public Accountants as a framework. This Act also makes a greater distinction between a CPA who passed the CPA exam only and a CPA who passed the CPA exam, met the experience requirements, and received a permit to practice. This provides the public with the significant distinction between a CPA who is a certificate holder only, and a CPA who is a permit holder. It also provides for a peer review for those accounting firms that perform attest services as a requirement for permit renewal as a mechanism to ensure practice competency. Author: Senator Poore

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Accountancy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateSS 1 for SB 218 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-11SenateSS 1 for SB 218 - Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2016-05-05SenateSS 1 for SB 218 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-05SenateSS 1 for SB 218 - Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-05SenateSS 1 for SB 218 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2016-05-05SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2016-05-03SenateSubstituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 218
2016-04-13SenateReported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2016-03-24SenateAssigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback