DE SB215 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Under this bill full-time county and municipal police officers and full-time uniformed firefighters in the City of Wilmington could elect to have their pension or disability pensions reduced by 3% and thereby increase the survivor’s pension from 50% to 75%.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The County And Municipal Police/firefighter Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2012-06-12 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (FINANCE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |