DE SB214 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act extends the effective date of Chapter 249, Volume 83 of the Laws of Delaware (Senate Bill No. 169 of the 151st General Assembly) from January 1, 2023 to July 1, 2024.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 249, Volume 83 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Delaware Child Care Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-01-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-01-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-26 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2022-01-20 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2022-01-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-01-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |