DE SB209 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies that treatment required for participants in the domestic violence first offenders program must be domestic violence treatment with a Domestic Violence Coordinating Council certified treatment provider.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Court Of The State Of Delaware And Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2016-04-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |