DE SB209 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides an important tool for combatting obstruction of justice by those who would purposely make false statements to law-enforcement during criminal investigations. Federal investigators and many states’ law-enforcement officers rely on statutory provisions specifically enacted to prevent those interviewed in the course of criminal investigations from providing false information. See, e.g., 18 U.S.C. 1001 (False Statements Accountability Act of 1996). Delaware has no such statute and, therefore, Delaware law-enforcement officers and agencies regularly face witnesses who seek to prevent, hinder or delay criminal investigations by lying with impunity to those officers. This Act closes that gap by allowing for the prosecution of one who intends to obstruct a criminal investigation by knowingly providing a false and material statement to law-enforcement.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Obstruction Of Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2012-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2012-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2012-05-17 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-25 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |