DE SB198 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill eliminates the prohibition against hunting for deer on Sundays. Additionally, it maintains the applicable agency regulating public lands authority and discretion to regulate, including prohibition of, deer hunting on Sundays. Lastly, the bill allows for the harvesting of deer on Sundays through DNRECs deer depredation programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulations And Prohibitions Concerning Game And Fish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback