DE SB198 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill eliminates the prohibition against hunting for deer on Sundays. Additionally, it maintains the applicable agency regulating public lands authority and discretion to regulate, including prohibition of, deer hunting on Sundays. Lastly, the bill allows for the harvesting of deer on Sundays through DNRECs deer depredation programs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulations And Prohibitions Concerning Game And Fish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate |