DE SB197 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill defines regulatory responsibilities of federal and state government with respect to radioactive material licensing and enforcement, revises text for brevity and makes other technical corrections.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Radiation Control.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |