DE SB196 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends various sections of the Delaware Uniform Commercial Code (the Act) to keep it current. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Commerce And Trade.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |