DE SB196 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 13 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 13 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill restores language to the Delaware Code that was inadvertently repealed in 2010 when SB 240 and HB 419 were enacted concurrently. This bill adds cats to the list of domestic animals that are protected under the dangerous dog law. Cats are domestic animals and dogs that viciously attack a cat on the property of its owner or under the immediate control of its owner should be evaluated according to dangerous dog provisions.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Dangerous Dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 13 On Its Merits |
2014-05-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |