DE SB194 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes the following changes to Delaware Statutory Trust Act (the Act) to keep it current and to maintain its national preeminence. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 38, Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Statutory Trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-30 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |