DE SB187 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act ensures that educators hired after the effective date of this Act, who earned graduate degrees prior to becoming educators, receive credit on the salary schedule for those degrees regardless of the specific subject area of those degrees. Once an individual is employed as an educator, in order to receive credit for any graduate degrees earned after that time, such degree must be in the subject area in which the educator is employed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2024-01-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-10 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2024-01-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |