DE SB181 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act allows designated caregivers to possess and administer, and minor qualifying patients to use, medical marijuana oil for minor qualifying patients on school busses and on the grounds of the preschool, primary, or secondary school in which the minor qualifying patient is enrolled.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Medical Marijuana Oil
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 4 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |