DE SB168 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
According to the U.S. Bureau of Justice Statistics, an estimated 42% of all face-to-face contact between individuals and law-enforcement officers occurred during a traffic stop.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14, Title 18, And Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Driver Education On Traffic Stop Procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 13 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-06 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 168 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |