DE SB162 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services Task Force ("the Task Force"), which was created under Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 62 and extended by House Bill No. 345, both of the 150th General Assembly. This Act fulfills 2 of the Task Force's many recommendations, by requiring that the chair or vice chair of the Advisory Council to the Division of Developmental Disabilities Services be an individual with a developmental disability, and amending the Advisory Council membership to include the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Advisory Council To The Division Of Developmental Disabilities Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Kendra Johnson [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2021-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 162 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-04 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 162 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |