DE SB159 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act removes membership with the Blood Bank of Delaware as a recognized benefit by the State due to changes in policies in how hospitals and insurance companies bill for blood replacement and blood replacement procedures.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Blood Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-03-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-23 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2023-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |