DE SB156 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends ยง 2532 of Title 29, in the Not-for-Profit Healthcare Conversion Act, to ensure that the Attorney General has sufficient time to review a proposed not-for-profit healthcare conversion and, if appropriate, take action to protect the charitable assets being held for public benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conversion Transactions For Not-for-profit Healthcare Entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-05-02 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-05-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback