DE SB156 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends ยง 2532 of Title 29, in the Not-for-Profit Healthcare Conversion Act, to ensure that the Attorney General has sufficient time to review a proposed not-for-profit healthcare conversion and, if appropriate, take action to protect the charitable assets being held for public benefit.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Conversion Transactions For Not-for-profit Healthcare Entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. James Johnson [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-02 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-05-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |