DE SB151 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill addresses informed consent for disclosing genetic information by adding those individuals authorized to access EMR and DHIN.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Genetic Information.
Sponsors
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2015-06-26 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |